Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1057
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Substituted CS/CS/HB 1057
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Retained on Special Order Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/28/22, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 02/16/22, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2022
|
Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/26/22, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|