Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1952 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill March 1, 2022
Bill January 26, 2022

Analysis

Analysis March 1, 2022
Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis February 18, 2022
Analysis February 15, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022