|
02/25/2022
|
Chapter No. 2022-8
|
|
|
|
02/24/2022
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
02/17/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2022
|
Passed; YEAS 116, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Substituted for HB 7007
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/1/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2022
|
Passed; YEAS 35 NAYS 0 208
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/19/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/13/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/16/2021
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/03/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/03/2021
|
Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/25/2021
|
On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 11/03/21, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/25/2021
|
Submitted for consideration by Health Policy
|
|
|