Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S7000 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 3, 2021

Enrolled

Bill February 10, 2022

Analysis

Analysis January 13, 2022
Analysis January 12, 2022
Analysis November 3, 2021
Analysis November 2, 2021

Prefiled

Bill October 25, 2021