Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1475
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Substituted CS/HB 1475
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Retained on Special Order Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
CS by Appropriations read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/28/22, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
Subcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 02/02/22, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/13/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/30/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/30/2021
|
Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/22/2021
|
On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 11/30/21, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/22/2021
|
Submitted for consideration by Environment and Natural Resources
|
|
|