Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S7012 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 30, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill March 1, 2022

Analysis

Analysis March 1, 2022
Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis February 4, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022
Analysis November 30, 2021
Analysis November 29, 2021

Prefiled

Bill November 22, 2021