|
02/25/2022
|
Chapter No. 2022-10
|
|
|
|
02/24/2022
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
02/17/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Passed; YEAS 87, NAYS 31
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Substituted for HB 7021
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/9/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2022
|
Passed; YEAS 22 NAYS 13 179
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/19/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/13/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/13/2021
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/30/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/30/2021
|
Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Judiciary; YEAS 7 NAYS 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/22/2021
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 11/30/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/22/2021
|
Submitted for consideration by Judiciary
|
|
|