Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S7014 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 30, 2021

Enrolled

Bill February 11, 2022

Analysis

Analysis January 13, 2022
Analysis January 12, 2022
Analysis November 30, 2021
Analysis November 29, 2021

Prefiled

Bill November 22, 2021