Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 02/24/2022 | Now in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 02/22/22, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/20/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/20/2022 | Referred to Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 01/13/2022 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/13/2022 | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Agriculture; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/10/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 01/13/22, 11:00 am, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/10/2022 | Submitted for consideration by Agriculture |