Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S7028 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 24, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis January 13, 2022
Analysis January 12, 2022

Prefiled

Bill January 10, 2022