|
04/19/2022
|
Chapter No. 2022-70
|
|
|
|
04/19/2022
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
04/19/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Passed; YEAS 77, NAYS 40
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Amendment 440891 not allowed for consideration
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Amendment 190993 not allowed for consideration
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/8/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Passed as amended; YEAS 22 NAYS 15
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Amendment(s) adopted (356900, 544572, 958072) 682
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Retained on Special Order Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 11 NAYS 9
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/24/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Education; YEAS 6 NAYS 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Education, 02/08/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
Submitted for consideration by Education
|
|
|