Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S7044 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 4, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 10, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 9, 2022
Analysis February 7, 2022

Prefiled

Bill February 3, 2022