|
11/14/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-349
|
|
|
|
11/13/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
11/13/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Substituted for SB 2-C
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Withdrawn from Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Referred to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 110, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
11/06/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
11/06/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
11/06/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (11/7/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
11/06/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
11/06/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
11/06/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
11/06/2023
|
Reported out of Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/06/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Added to Appropriations Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|