|
05/18/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-96
|
|
|
|
05/17/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/16/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Substituted for CS/SB 636
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Withdrawn from Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 113, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/30/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Reported out of Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Education & Employment Committee (Amended)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Now in Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred to Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Reported out of Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Added to Civil Justice Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Reported out of Education Quality Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Favorable by Education Quality Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2023
|
Added to Education Quality Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
12/23/2022
|
Now in Education Quality Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/23/2022
|
Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/23/2022
|
Referred to Education Quality Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/06/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|