Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0019 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 6, 2022

Enrolled

Bill April 19, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 18, 2023
Analysis May 17, 2023
Analysis March 10, 2023
Analysis March 6, 2023
Analysis February 15, 2023
Analysis February 8, 2023
Analysis January 25, 2023
Analysis January 18, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 10, 2023
Bill February 15, 2023