|
07/07/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-317
|
|
|
|
05/30/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/16/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 87, NAYS 25
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Amendment 331332 Concur
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Added to Senate Message List
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 36 NAYS 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Amendment(s) adopted (331332)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Substituted for CS/CS/CS/SB 96
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Withdrawn from Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Referred to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 111, NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Amendment 831149 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Amendment 375075 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Amendment 129863 adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/27/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported out of Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
PCS added to Infrastructure Strategies Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Now in Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Reported out of Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Favorable by Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Added to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2023
|
Now in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2023
|
Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2023
|
Referred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Reported out of Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2023
|
Added to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
12/23/2022
|
Now in Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/23/2022
|
Referred to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/06/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|