Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0021 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 6, 2022

Engrossed

Bill May 3, 2023
Bill April 27, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 3, 2023

Analysis

Analysis July 10, 2023
Analysis May 9, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis February 9, 2023
Analysis January 19, 2023
Analysis January 10, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 11, 2023
Bill January 19, 2023