House
|
04/20/2023
|
Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 162 (Ch. 2023-204)
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Substituted CS/CS/CS/SB 162
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/20/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Reported out of Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added to Infrastructure Strategies Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Now in Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Reported out of Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Favorable by Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Added to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Now in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
Reported out of Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Added to Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
12/23/2022
|
Now in Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/23/2022
|
Referred to Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/06/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|