Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0023 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 6, 2022

Analysis

Analysis June 14, 2023
Analysis May 1, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023
Analysis March 23, 2023
Analysis March 15, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023
Analysis February 24, 2023
Analysis February 15, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 28, 2023
Bill February 24, 2023