|
05/26/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-140; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 35 (Ch. 2023-141)
|
|
|
|
05/25/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/16/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Substituted for CS/SB 56
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Withdrawn from Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Referred to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 115, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/20/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Now in Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Reported out of Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Reported out of Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Favorable by Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
12/23/2022
|
Now in Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/23/2022
|
Referred to Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
12/23/2022
|
Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/23/2022
|
Referred to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/07/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|