Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0033 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 7, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 1, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 6, 2023
Analysis May 16, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023
Analysis March 9, 2023
Analysis March 8, 2023
Analysis February 22, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 28, 2023