House | 05/05/2023 | Died in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 783 (Ch. 2023-184) | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Now in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Referred to Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Referred to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | CS Filed | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Reported out of Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Favorable with CS by Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | PCS added to Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 12/23/2022 | Now in Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee | ||
House | 12/23/2022 | Referred to Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee | ||
House | 12/09/2022 | Filed |