House
|
05/01/2023
|
Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 718 (Ch. 2023-305)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/28/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Favorable with CS by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Original reference removed: Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Reported out of Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
12/23/2022
|
Now in Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/23/2022
|
Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
12/23/2022
|
Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/14/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|