Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0041 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 14, 2022

Analysis

Analysis June 29, 2023
Analysis May 16, 2023
Analysis March 23, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023
Analysis March 8, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 23, 2023
Bill March 13, 2023