House
|
05/05/2023
|
Died on Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Reported out of Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Added to Appropriations Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Reported out of Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Added to Criminal Justice Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
12/23/2022
|
Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/23/2022
|
Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/14/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|