LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Florida FL
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
House
Bills
H0043
Draft Versions
FL
Florida House Bill H0043
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Florida 2023 Regular Session
Florida House Bill H0043
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
December 14, 2022
Compare
Comm Sub
Bill
April 19, 2023
Compare
Bill
February 10, 2023
Compare
Analysis
Analysis
April 19, 2023
Analysis
April 18, 2023
Analysis
February 21, 2023
Analysis
February 16, 2023
Analysis
February 10, 2023
Analysis
February 3, 2023