House
|
04/18/2023
|
Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 50 (Ch. 2023-131)
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Substituted CS/SB 50
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/18/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Favorable by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Reported out of Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Favorable by Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added to Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Now in Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2023
|
Reported out of Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Added to Civil Justice Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2023
|
Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2023
|
Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/21/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|