Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0075 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 21, 2022

Analysis

Analysis June 1, 2023
Analysis May 18, 2023
Analysis March 23, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023
Analysis March 10, 2023
Analysis January 26, 2023
Analysis January 24, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill January 27, 2023