House | 04/20/2023 | Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 218 (Ch. 2023-132) | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Substituted SB 218 | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/20/2023) | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Bill released to House Calendar | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Favorable by Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Now in Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Reported out of Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Favorable by Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Added to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/10/2023 | Now in Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/10/2023 | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 01/10/2023 | Referred to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/04/2023 | Filed |