Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0117 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 4, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 6, 2023
Analysis May 19, 2023
Analysis March 17, 2023
Analysis March 16, 2023
Analysis February 23, 2023