Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Died in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Passed; YEAS 113, NAYS 1
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/25/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Favorable by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Reported out of Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Favorable by Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Added to Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Now in Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Reported out of Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Favorable by Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Added to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Now in Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Referred to Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|