|
06/02/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-181
|
|
|
|
06/02/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/23/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 31 NAYS 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Amendment(s) failed (318830)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Substituted for CS/SB 494
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Withdrawn from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 89, NAYS 22
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Amendment 629637 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Amendment 138913 ruled out of order
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Amendment 832771 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Amendment 363967 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Amendment 343041 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Amendment 976903 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Amendment 560087 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Amendment 798907 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Amendment 211927 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Amendment 225077 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Amendment 036617 ruled out of order
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Amendment 916777 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Amendment 077531 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Amendment 576651 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Amendment 494379 ruled out of order
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/20/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Reported out of Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Favorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Added to Civil Justice Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|