Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0133 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 9, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 20, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 28, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 13, 2023
Analysis May 17, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023
Analysis March 10, 2023
Analysis February 10, 2023
Analysis February 3, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 15, 2023