House | 05/05/2023 | Died in Infrastructure Strategies Committee; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 21 (Ch. 2023-317) | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 02/24/2023 | Now in Infrastructure Strategies Committee | ||
House | 02/24/2023 | Reported out of Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/24/2023 | Favorable by Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Added to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Now in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Reported out of Transportation & Modals Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Favorable by Transportation & Modals Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Added to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/17/2023 | Now in Transportation & Modals Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/17/2023 | Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee | ||
House | 01/17/2023 | Referred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/17/2023 | Referred to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/10/2023 | Filed |