Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0145 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2023

Analysis

Analysis February 24, 2023
Analysis February 20, 2023
Analysis February 8, 2023
Analysis February 1, 2023