Florida 2023 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0145 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 02/01/2023

                    This docum ent does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill sponsor or House of Representatives. 
STORAGE NAME: h0145.TMS 
DATE: 2/1/2023 
 
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES STAFF ANALYSIS  
 
BILL #: HB 145    Transportation Facility Designations 
SPONSOR(S): Daniels 
TIED BILLS:    IDEN./SIM. BILLS:   
 
REFERENCE 	ACTION ANALYST STAFF DIRECTOR or 
BUDGET/POLICY CHIEF 
1) Transportation & Modals Subcommittee 	Lewis Hinshelwood 
2) Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations 
Subcommittee 
   
3) Infrastructure Strategies Committee   
SUMMARY ANALYSIS 
State law authorizes legislative designations of transportation facilities, such as bridges, interchanges, or 
portions of roads, for honorary or memorial purposes or to distinguish a particular facility. Legislative 
designations do not change the official names of the facilities and do not require local governments and private 
entities to change street signs, mailing addresses, or 911 emergency telephone system listings to account for 
the designations. The Department of Transportation (DOT) may not erect the markers for each designation 
unless the appropriate city or county commission enacts a resolution supporting the designation.  
 
The bill designates the “Coach Gwendolyn Maxwell Bridge to Ribault” in Duval County. Under the bill, DOT 
must erect suitable markers for the designation.   
 
The bill will have an insignificant negative fiscal impact to the State Transportation Trust Fund associated with 
erecting suitable markers for the designation. The cost can be absorbed within DOT’s existing resources. 
 
The bill provides an effective date of July 1, 2023.  
   STORAGE NAME: h0145.TMS 	PAGE: 2 
DATE: 2/1/2023 
  
FULL ANALYSIS 
I.  SUBSTANTIVE ANALYSIS 
 
A. EFFECT OF PROPOSED CHANGES: 
Present Situation 
 
Transportation Facility Designations  
Under current law, the Legislature may designate a transportation facility, such as a bridge, 
interchange, or portion of a road, for honorary or memorial purposes or to distinguish a particular 
facility. Legislative designations do not officially change the existing names of the facilities and do not 
require local governments or private entities to change street signs, mailing addresses, or 911 
emergency telephone-number system listings to account for the designations.
1
 
 
Regarding the naming of state buildings and other facilities, state law provides that except as 
specifically provided by law, state buildings, roads, bridges, parks, recreational complexes, and other 
similar facilities may not be named for a living person.
2
   
 
Road Markers 
When the Legislature establishes road or bridge designations, the Department of Transportation (DOT) 
is required to place a marker at each terminus or intersection of the highway segment or bridge 
designated and may erect other markers it deems appropriate for the designated transportation facility.
3
 
Markers may not be erected until the appropriate city or county commission passes a resolution in 
support of the particular designation. Additionally, if the designated facility is located in multiple cities or 
counties, each affected local government must pass a resolution in support of the designation before 
DOT can install the markers.
4
  
 
Coach Gwendolyn Maxwell 
Gwendolyn Maxwell, recognized as one of the most successful girls’ track and field coaches in the 
history of Florida, was a lifelong educator for 36 years and the track and field coach at Ribault High 
School for 20 years.
5
 Maxwell directed five teams to state titles, was named coach of the year five 
times, and was the Florida representative for the national track coach of the year three times.
6
 Maxwell 
was inducted into the Ribault Athletic Hall of Fame in October, 2018, as well as the Florida Athletics 
Coaches Association Hall of Fame in 1995.
7
 Maxwell passed away on June 16, 2020, at the age of 86, 
after a nearly decade long battle with Alzheimer’s.
8
  
 
Effect of the Bill 
 
Under the bill, the bridge on Howell Drive over the Ribault River in Duval County is designated as 
"Coach Gwendolyn Maxwell Bridge to Ribault.”
9
 The bill directs DOT to erect suitable markers. 
 
B. SECTION DIRECTORY: 
                                                
1
 S. 334.071(1), F.S.  
2
 S. 267.062(1), F.S.  
3
 S. 334.071(2), F.S. 
4
 S. 334.071(3), F.S. 
5
 Cole Pepper, Legendary Ribault track coach Gwendolyn Maxwell dies at 86, News4Jax (June 17, 2020), 
https://www.news4jax.com/sports/2020/06/18/legendary-ribault-track-coach-gwendolyn-maxwell-dies-at-86/ (last visited 
1/12/2023). 
6
 Id.  
7
 Gene Frenette, Gwendolyn Maxwell, state championship track coach at Ribault, dies at 86, The Florida Times-Union 
(June 17, 2020), https://www.jacksonville.com/story/sports/high-school/2020/06/17/gwendolyn-maxwell-state-
championship-track-coach-at-ribault-dies-at-86/41726449/ (last visited 1/12/2023). 
8
 Id. 
9
 The bridge on Howell Drive over the Ribault River in Duval County is not a part of the state highway system. The bridge 
is maintained by the City of Jacksonville.  STORAGE NAME: h0145.TMS 	PAGE: 3 
DATE: 2/1/2023 
  
Section 1: Designates “Coach Gwendolyn Maxwell Bridge to Ribault”; directs DOT to erect suitable 
markers.  
 
Section 2: Provides an effective date of July 1, 2023.  
 
II.  FISCAL ANALYSIS & ECONOMIC IMPACT STATEMENT 
 
A. FISCAL IMPACT ON STATE GOVERNMENT: 
 
1. Revenues: 
None. 
 
2. Expenditures: 
DOT estimates a cost of $1,480 per designation for the appropriate markers, which provides for two 
signs per designation at $740 per sign.
10
 Therefore, the bill has an estimated negative fiscal impact 
of $1,480 to the State Transportation Trust Fund. This cost can be absorbed within existing DOT 
resources.
11
 
 
B. FISCAL IMPACT ON LOCAL GOVERNMENTS: 
 
1. Revenues: 
None. 
 
2. Expenditures: 
None. 
 
C. DIRECT ECONOMIC IMPACT ON PRIVATE SECTOR: 
None. 
 
D. FISCAL COMMENTS: 
None. 
III.  COMMENTS 
 
A. CONSTITUTIONAL ISSUES: 
 
 1. Applicability of Municipality/County Mandates Provision: 
Not applicable. This bill does not appear to affect county or municipal governments.  
 
 2. Other: 
None. 
 
B. RULE-MAKING AUTHORITY: 
None. 
 
C. DRAFTING ISSUES OR OTHER COMMENTS: 
None. 
                                                
10
 Email from Amanda Marsh, Legislative Programs Office, Florida Department of Transportation, RE: FDOT Memorial 
Roadway Designation Sign Estimate (Dec. 28, 2022).  
11
 Id.  STORAGE NAME: h0145.TMS 	PAGE: 4 
DATE: 2/1/2023 
  
IV.  AMENDMENTS/COM MITTEE SUBSTITUTE CHANGES 
Not applicable.