Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Died in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 113, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/25/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Favorable by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Reported out of Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Favorable by Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Now in Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Reported out of Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Added to Ways & Means Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Now in Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Referred to Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|