Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0161 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 23, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 10, 2023
Analysis March 8, 2023
Analysis February 15, 2023
Analysis February 13, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 16, 2023