House | 05/02/2023 | Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 164 (Ch. 2023-297) | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | Bill referred to House Calendar | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | CS Filed | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Reported out of Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 02/24/2023 | Now in Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 02/24/2023 | Reported out of Criminal Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Favorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Added to Criminal Justice Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/17/2023 | Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/17/2023 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 01/17/2023 | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/10/2023 | Filed |