House
|
05/05/2023
|
Died on Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported out of Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Added to Appropriations Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Reported out of Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Favorable by Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Now in Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Reported out of PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Favorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Added to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Now in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|