Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0195 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis March 23, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis February 15, 2023
Analysis February 9, 2023