Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Died in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 99, NAYS 15
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/27/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
PCS added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Reported out of Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Favorable by Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Added to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Now in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Referred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Reported out of Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Added to Criminal Justice Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|