Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0197 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 20, 2023
Bill March 9, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 20, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 17, 2023
Analysis March 8, 2023
Analysis March 3, 2023