Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0201 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 19, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 19, 2023
Analysis April 16, 2023
Analysis March 22, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 16, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023