House
|
05/05/2023
|
Died in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported out of Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Added to Ways & Means Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Now in Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Referred to Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Reported out of Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Now in Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|