Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0235 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill March 20, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023
Analysis March 17, 2023