House
|
04/04/2023
|
Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2023-239), CS/SB 7024 (Ch. 2023-193)
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Substituted CS/SB 7024
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/3/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Original reference removed: State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Reported out of Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
PCS added to Appropriations Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Reported out of Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added to Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Now in Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|