Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0239 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 8, 2023
Analysis May 18, 2023
Analysis March 30, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023
Analysis March 9, 2023
Analysis March 7, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 28, 2023
Bill March 9, 2023