Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Died in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 103, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Amendment 372365 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/28/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/25/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 3)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported out of Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Added to Infrastructure Strategies Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Now in Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Reported out of Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Now in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Reported out of Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added to Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Now in Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|