Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0261 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 28, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill March 23, 2023
Bill March 9, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis April 6, 2023
Analysis March 23, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023
Analysis March 9, 2023
Analysis March 7, 2023